THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 13:26:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raman Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verma (CPSO#: 86307 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raman Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verma (CPSO#: 86307 )
Business Address: 499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMAN KUMAR VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMAN KUMAR VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007