THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:10:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-2368
Fax: 613-548-1374
Address: Quite Health Care
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
Phone: 613-392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Blackmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blackmore (CPSO#: 86330 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-2368
Fax: 613-548-1374
Address: Quite Health Care
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
Phone: 613-392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Blackmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blackmore (CPSO#: 86330 )
Business Address: Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 3X1
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Empire 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007