THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bielecki, Barbara Ania Kuziora (Used Until: 28 Jan 2015) Kuziora, Barbara Ania (Used Until: 17 Feb 2010)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
15 Mountain Ave South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Bielecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielecki (CPSO#: 86344 )

General Information

Former Name: Bielecki, Barbara Ania Kuziora (Used Until: 28 Jan 2015) Kuziora, Barbara Ania (Used Until: 17 Feb 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 311
15 Mountain Ave South
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4911
Fax: (905) 662-1688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barbara Bielecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielecki (CPSO#: 86344 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANIA BIELECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELECKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANIA BIELECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELECKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007