THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 10:01:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Extension: 2214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Matava (CPSO#: 86349 ) Dr. C. Matava (CPSO#: 86046 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7445
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Extension: 2214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Matava (CPSO#: 86349 ) Dr. C. Matava (CPSO#: 86046 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7445
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHELLE KRISTEN MATAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHELLE KRISTEN MATAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007