THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 11:42:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anand (CPSO#: 86392 )
Business Address: PO Box 91569 Rpo Mer Bleu
Family First Health Centre
Orléans ON K1W 0A6
Business Address: Family First Health Centre
P.O. Box 51031 375 Des Epinettes
Orléans Ontario K1E 3E0
(613) 841-7009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K4A 5E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pamela Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Anand (CPSO#: 86392 )
Business Address: PO Box 91569 Rpo Mer Bleu
Family First Health Centre
Orléans ON K1W 0A6
Business Address: Family First Health Centre
P.O. Box 51031 375 Des Epinettes
Orléans Ontario K1E 3E0
(613) 841-7009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAMELA ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007