THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:21:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4762
Fax: 844-222-4523
Address: 1101 Kingston Road
Unit 230
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Toronto Ontario L3Y9A2
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: 340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416 928 1335
Fax: 416 928 5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mojgan Hassanlou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassanlou (CPSO#: 86409 )
Business Address: Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: Unit 44
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 202C - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4762

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-4762
Fax: 844-222-4523
Address: 1101 Kingston Road
Unit 230
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: 16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Toronto Ontario L3Y9A2
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Address: 340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416 928 1335
Fax: 416 928 5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mojgan Hassanlou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassanlou (CPSO#: 86409 )
Business Address: Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: Unit 44
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 9A2
(905) 235-8055
Business Address: 202C - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4762

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN HASSANLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANLOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOJGAN HASSANLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANLOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007