THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:29:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-1300
Fax: (519) 322-1322
Address: Erie Shores health care
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda (CPSO#: 86416 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-1300
Fax: (519) 322-1322
Address: Erie Shores health care
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda (CPSO#: 86416 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTO GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERTO GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2007