THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 400
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-8335
Fax: (705) 326-6365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Dharssi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dharssi (CPSO#: 86458 )
Business Address: 400 - 100 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y9
(705) 326-8335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 400
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-8335
Fax: (705) 326-6365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karim Dharssi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dharssi (CPSO#: 86458 )
Business Address: 400 - 100 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Y9
(705) 326-8335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM DHARSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARSSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM DHARSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHARSSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007