THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: 9056814808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 701-4980 Kingsway
Burnaby, BC V5H 4K7
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saima F. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Husain (CPSO#: 86469 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Medicine
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
1-905-632-3737

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: 9056814808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 701-4980 Kingsway
Burnaby, BC V5H 4K7
Date Received: 19 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saima F. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Husain (CPSO#: 86469 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Medicine
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
1-905-632-3737

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA FATHIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIMA FATHIMA HUSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007