THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:17:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 443-7666
Fax: 1-519-231-1013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather M. Ringrose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ringrose (CPSO#: 86486 )
Business Address: 28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 443-7666
Fax: 1-519-231-1013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jan 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 07 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather M. Ringrose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ringrose (CPSO#: 86486 )
Business Address: 28 Sovereign Street East
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER MACGREGOR RINGROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGROSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER MACGREGOR RINGROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINGROSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007