THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Big Thunder Orthopedics
Suite 206
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-1123
Fax: (807) 344-1166
Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-8201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Riverside Health Care
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7
Phone: 807-274-3266
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West, Kenora, ON, P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3939

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Hornepayne Community Hospital
LOCATION: Hornepayne

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Le Francois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le Francois (CPSO#: 86542 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 344-1123
Business Address: 10 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7
(807) 274-3266
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Big Thunder Orthopedics
Suite 206
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-1123
Fax: (807) 344-1166
Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-8201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Riverside Health Care
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7
Phone: 807-274-3266
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West, Kenora, ON, P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3939

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Hornepayne Community Hospital
LOCATION: Hornepayne

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Le Francois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le Francois (CPSO#: 86542 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 344-1123
Business Address: 10 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances Ontario P9A 2B7
(807) 274-3266
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA IRENE LE FRANCOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FRANCOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TINA IRENE LE FRANCOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FRANCOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007