THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A3-14, Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St.
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43778
Fax: 905-297-9000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legault & Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Legault (CPSO#: 86543 ) Dr. S. Oczkowski (CPSO#: 90622 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-20
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42446
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-14
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42446

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A3-14, Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St.
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43778
Fax: 905-297-9000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legault & Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Legault (CPSO#: 86543 ) Dr. S. Oczkowski (CPSO#: 90622 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-20
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42446
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-14
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42446

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JANET LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JANET LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007