THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:33:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: Leung, Natalie W M (Used Until: 26 Aug 2007)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 485 Windermere Rd
London ON N5X 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194382102
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hertzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hertzman (CPSO#: 86545 ) Dr. D. Hertzman (CPSO#: 83255 )
Business Address: 105-262 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1T8
(888) 495-5898
Business Address: 485 Windermere Road
P O Box 1449 Station B
London Ontario N6A 5M2
(519) 438-2012
Business Address: 790 Maitland St
London ON N5Y 2W5

General Information

Former Name: Leung, Natalie W M (Used Until: 26 Aug 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 485 Windermere Rd
London ON N5X 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194382102
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hertzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hertzman (CPSO#: 86545 ) Dr. D. Hertzman (CPSO#: 83255 )
Business Address: 105-262 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 1T8
(888) 495-5898
Business Address: 485 Windermere Road
P O Box 1449 Station B
London Ontario N6A 5M2
(519) 438-2012
Business Address: 790 Maitland St
London ON N5Y 2W5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE W M HERTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE W M HERTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007