THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:51:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda Sohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohn (CPSO#: 86564 )
Business Address: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 286-3830

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 286-3830
Fax: (416) 286-3133
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda Sohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohn (CPSO#: 86564 )
Business Address: Unit 140
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 2W2
(416) 286-3830

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA SOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA SOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007