THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Tracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tracey (CPSO#: 86567 )
Business Address: Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Suite 1C
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Tracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tracey (CPSO#: 86567 )
Business Address: Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Suite 1C
Nepean Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH TRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRACEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT JOSEPH TRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRACEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007