THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 02:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Mental Health & Addictions Service
17-037, 17th Floor Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Willer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Willer (CPSO#: 86576 )
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 17-037
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 3809

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Mental Health & Addictions Service
17-037, 17th Floor Cardinal Carter
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Willer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Willer (CPSO#: 86576 )
Business Address: St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 17-037
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 3809

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007