THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-4256 Bathurst St
North York Family Health Team
Clanton Park Family Medicine
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-332-0777
Fax: 416-331-9902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaul Y. Tarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tarek (CPSO#: 86582 )
Business Address: North York Family Health Team
Bathurst Family Physicians
300 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 222-3011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-4256 Bathurst St
North York Family Health Team
Clanton Park Family Medicine
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-332-0777
Fax: 416-331-9902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaul Y. Tarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tarek (CPSO#: 86582 )
Business Address: North York Family Health Team
Bathurst Family Physicians
300 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 222-3011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUL YISROEL TAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUL YISROEL TAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007