THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2153
Fax: (905) 883-2156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Passaperuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Passaperuma (CPSO#: 86588 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2153

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2153
Fax: (905) 883-2156

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Passaperuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Passaperuma (CPSO#: 86588 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2153

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVITHA NAYANATHARA HEWA PASSAPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSAPERUMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVITHA NAYANATHARA HEWA PASSAPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSAPERUMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007