THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: DermAtelier on Avenue
1896 Avenue Road
Toronto ON M5M 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 787 6060
Fax: 416 623 7303
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
RKS Dermatology Clinic, 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 7546
Fax: 416 323 6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 11 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renee A. Beach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beach (CPSO#: 86594 )
Business Address: 302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York Ontario M4S 2V6
(416) 750-8400
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
5ht Floor RKS Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: Bay Dermatology Centre
Suite 536
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 515-8808
Business Address: 1896 Avenue Rd
DermAtelier on Avenue
North York ON M5M 3Z8
416 787 6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: DermAtelier on Avenue
1896 Avenue Road
Toronto ON M5M 3Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 787 6060
Fax: 416 623 7303
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
RKS Dermatology Clinic, 5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 7546
Fax: 416 323 6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 11 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renee A. Beach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beach (CPSO#: 86594 )
Business Address: 302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York Ontario M4S 2V6
(416) 750-8400
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
5ht Floor RKS Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: Bay Dermatology Centre
Suite 536
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 515-8808
Business Address: 1896 Avenue Rd
DermAtelier on Avenue
North York ON M5M 3Z8
416 787 6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE AYANA BEACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE AYANA BEACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007