THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 07:42:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 Adelaide St S
Grounded Roots Open Wings
Unit B
London ON N5Z 3L2
Phone: (519) 878-8621
Fax: (519) 913-4045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ceara J. McNeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McNeil (CPSO#: 86598 )
Business Address: 685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Y 2L4
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: 320 Adelaide St S
Unit B
London ON N5Z 3L2
(519) 878-8621
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 320 Adelaide St S
Grounded Roots Open Wings
Unit B
London ON N5Z 3L2
Phone: (519) 878-8621
Fax: (519) 913-4045

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ceara J. McNeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McNeil (CPSO#: 86598 )
Business Address: 685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario N5Y 2L4
(519) 601-7171
Business Address: 320 Adelaide St S
Unit B
London ON N5Z 3L2
(519) 878-8621
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEARA JEAN MCNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEARA JEAN MCNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007