THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:37:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad del Salvador, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4539
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Melicharkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Melicharkova (CPSO#: 86617 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad del Salvador, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4539
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Melicharkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Melicharkova (CPSO#: 86617 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA MELICHARKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELICHARKOVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA MELICHARKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELICHARKOVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad del Salvador, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007