THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:07:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of General Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vogt & Moffat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vogt (CPSO#: 86632 ) Dr. B. Moffat (CPSO#: 95256 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777 Station B
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commisiioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: London Health Science Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E2 - 215
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8547
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of General Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vogt & Moffat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vogt (CPSO#: 86632 ) Dr. B. Moffat (CPSO#: 95256 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777 Station B
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commisiioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: London Health Science Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E2 - 215
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8547
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY VOGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOGT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY VOGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOGT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007