THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-205 McLaughlin Road
Lindsay Ontario K9V 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 878-5253
Fax: (705) 878-0087
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devon R. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McDonald (CPSO#: 86636 )
Business Address: Suite 203
205 McLaughlin Road
Lindsay Ontario K9V 0K7
(705) 878-5253
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-205 McLaughlin Road
Lindsay Ontario K9V 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 878-5253
Fax: (705) 878-0087
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devon R. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McDonald (CPSO#: 86636 )
Business Address: Suite 203
205 McLaughlin Road
Lindsay Ontario K9V 0K7
(705) 878-5253
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON RICHARD MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON RICHARD MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007