THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2630 Rutherford Road, Unit #200
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 548-4039
Fax: (647) 722-5440
Address: 830 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6Y8
Phone: (416) 572-5972
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Wynford Drive suite 103
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: 4164412111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13291 Yonge Street, Unit #401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2025 Midland Avenue, Suite #302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
Address: 7117 Bathurst Street, Unit #101
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 597-6222
Fax: (905) 597-4622
Address: 24-2810 Major Mackenzie Dr. W
Vaughan Ontario L6A 2C7
Phone: (289) 963-1644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Morong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morong (CPSO#: 86642 )
Business Address: Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-1599
Business Address: 101 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
(905) 597-6222
Business Address: 208 - 4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T7
(416) 292-3218
Business Address: B24 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3L2
(289) 963-1644
Business Address: Suite 200
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H2
(416) 548-4039
Business Address: 103-20 Wynford Drive
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 441-2111
Business Address: 830 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6Y8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2630 Rutherford Road, Unit #200
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 548-4039
Fax: (647) 722-5440
Address: 830 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6Y8
Phone: (416) 572-5972
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Wynford Drive suite 103
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
Phone: 4164412111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13291 Yonge Street, Unit #401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2025 Midland Avenue, Suite #302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: (416) 292-3218
Fax: (416) 292-3200
Address: 7117 Bathurst Street, Unit #101
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
Phone: (905) 597-6222
Fax: (905) 597-4622
Address: 24-2810 Major Mackenzie Dr. W
Vaughan Ontario L6A 2C7
Phone: (289) 963-1644
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Morong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morong (CPSO#: 86642 )
Business Address: Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-1599
Business Address: 101 - 7117 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 2J6
(905) 597-6222
Business Address: 208 - 4235 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T7
(416) 292-3218
Business Address: B24 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3L2
(289) 963-1644
Business Address: Suite 200
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H2
(416) 548-4039
Business Address: 103-20 Wynford Drive
North York Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 441-2111
Business Address: 830 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON M9W 6Y8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH MORONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH MORONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007