THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkdale Queen West Community
Health Centre (Queen West site)
168 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5V 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 703-8480
Fax: (416) 703-8479
Address: 303-1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Pun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pun (CPSO#: 86651 )
Business Address: Suite 303
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 536-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkdale Queen West Community
Health Centre (Queen West site)
168 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5V 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 703-8480
Fax: (416) 703-8479
Address: 303-1466 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5R 3S3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Pun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pun (CPSO#: 86651 )
Business Address: Suite 303
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 536-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CYNTHIA PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007