THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 227-12-111 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-329-9941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Collins (CPSO#: 86658 )
Business Address: 403 Ontario St
St Catharines ON L2N 1L5
905-934-3364 Extn: 4104
Business Address: Senior's Mental Health Outreach
26 Hiscott Street
Second Floor
St Catharines Ontario L2R 1C6
(905) 704-4068
Business Address: 7 Kenmore Crescent
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 4S4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 227-12-111 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 3P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-329-9941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Collins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Collins (CPSO#: 86658 )
Business Address: 403 Ontario St
St Catharines ON L2N 1L5
905-934-3364 Extn: 4104
Business Address: Senior's Mental Health Outreach
26 Hiscott Street
Second Floor
St Catharines Ontario L2R 1C6
(905) 704-4068
Business Address: 7 Kenmore Crescent
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 4S4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA LYNN COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA LYNN COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007