THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:00:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 40
875 Highland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 772-0869
Fax: (519) 772-0872

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Nedimovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nedimovic (CPSO#: 86668 )
Business Address: Highland Medical Group
Unit 40
875 Higland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y2
(519) 772-0869

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 40
875 Highland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 772-0869
Fax: (519) 772-0872

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Nedimovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nedimovic (CPSO#: 86668 )
Business Address: Highland Medical Group
Unit 40
875 Higland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y2
(519) 772-0869

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LJUBICA NEDIMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEDIMOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LJUBICA NEDIMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEDIMOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007