THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Palliative Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6080
Fax: (905) 952-3050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. So (CPSO#: 86683 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Palliative Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 6080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Palliative Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6080
Fax: (905) 952-3050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cindy So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. So (CPSO#: 86683 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Palliative Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521 Extn: 6080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY HOI-YUNG SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY HOI-YUNG SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007