THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 21:09:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
4 Cardinal Carter North Room 4 179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L.R. TAGGART MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Taggart (CPSO#: 86688 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
4 Cardinal Carter North, 4-179
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
4 Cardinal Carter North Room 4 179
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L.R. TAGGART MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Taggart (CPSO#: 86688 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
4 Cardinal Carter North, 4-179
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ROSE TAGGART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGGART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ROSE TAGGART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGGART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007