THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2390 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 762-8287
Fax: (416) 762-0709
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave, Room 401
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dustin Dalgorf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalgorf (CPSO#: 86722 )
Business Address: 101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 787-5511
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 2390 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P5
(416) 762-8287
Business Address: St. Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2390 Bloor St. West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 762-8287
Fax: (416) 762-0709
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave, Room 401
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dustin Dalgorf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalgorf (CPSO#: 86722 )
Business Address: 101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 787-5511
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: 2390 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1P5
(416) 762-8287
Business Address: St. Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSTIN MARK DALGORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALGORF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSTIN MARK DALGORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALGORF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007