THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035888
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Kaasa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaasa (CPSO#: 86729 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5888
Business Address: Suite 2W - 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035888
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Kaasa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaasa (CPSO#: 86729 )
Business Address: 3rd Floor
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
416-603-5888
Business Address: Suite 2W - 428
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL KAASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAASA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL KAASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAASA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007