THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:41:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 393 University Avenue
Ministry of Health
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-995-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 505 Consumers Rd
Medvisit Doctors Housecall Service
#901
North York ON M2J 4V8
Phone: 416-631-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17-1450 Kingston Rd
Durham Community Health Centre
Pickering ON L1V 1C1
Phone: 905-420-0333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nnorom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nnorom (CPSO#: 86730 )
Business Address: 1025 Queen St W
Mississauga ON L5H 4E1
416-535-8501 Extn: 77400

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nnorom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 393 University Avenue
Ministry of Health
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 437-995-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 505 Consumers Rd
Medvisit Doctors Housecall Service
#901
North York ON M2J 4V8
Phone: 416-631-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17-1450 Kingston Rd
Durham Community Health Centre
Pickering ON L1V 1C1
Phone: 905-420-0333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nnorom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nnorom (CPSO#: 86730 )
Business Address: 1025 Queen St W
Mississauga ON L5H 4E1
416-535-8501 Extn: 77400

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nnorom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ONYENYECHUKWU NNOROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NNOROM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ONYENYECHUKWU NNOROM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NNOROM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007