THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Address: 1 Blue Jays Way
Rogers Centre
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Poley (CPSO#: 86731 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: Roger's Centre
1 Blue Jays Way
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
(416) 341-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Address: 1 Blue Jays Way
Rogers Centre
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Poley (CPSO#: 86731 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Emergency Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: Roger's Centre
1 Blue Jays Way
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
(416) 341-1000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ANNE POLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL ANNE POLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007