THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 George Street
Heart institute
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 541-0030
Fax: (519) 339-0993
Address: London cardiac institute
1055 FANSHAWE PARK RD W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
Address: 89 Norman st. Sarnia
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Phone: 5194644400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GA Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Farag (CPSO#: 86741 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
London Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 245-5577
Business Address: 481 London Road
Lower Level
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 491-9990
Business Address: 201-1055 Fanshawe Park Road
London Ontario N6A 5P6
(519) 645-0146
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 333 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
6472732390

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Tanta University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 George Street
Heart institute
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 541-0030
Fax: (519) 339-0993
Address: London cardiac institute
1055 FANSHAWE PARK RD W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1584
Address: 89 Norman st. Sarnia
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Phone: 5194644400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GA Farag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Farag (CPSO#: 86741 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
London Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 245-5577
Business Address: 481 London Road
Lower Level
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 491-9990
Business Address: 201-1055 Fanshawe Park Road
London Ontario N6A 5P6
(519) 645-0146
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 333 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
6472732390

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ABDALLA REYAD FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ABDALLA REYAD FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007