THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:10:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre (Unity Health Toronto)
Microbiology / Chronic Infection Clinic
3G-103 Microbiology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4005
Fax: 416-530-6050
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital (Unity Health Toronto)
Division of Laboratory Medicine
RM 2-040 CC
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4005
Fax: 416-530-6050
Address: 2200 Rutherford Road
You've Got This Clinic
UTI Specialty Clinic
Suite 7
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
Phone: 289-217-0917
Fax: 289-217-0920

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G German Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. German (CPSO#: 86760 )
Business Address: 7 Paperbark Avenue
Vaughan Ontario L6A 0Y1
416-799-0861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre (Unity Health Toronto)
Microbiology / Chronic Infection Clinic
3G-103 Microbiology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4005
Fax: 416-530-6050
Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital (Unity Health Toronto)
Division of Laboratory Medicine
RM 2-040 CC
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4005
Fax: 416-530-6050
Address: 2200 Rutherford Road
You've Got This Clinic
UTI Specialty Clinic
Suite 7
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
Phone: 289-217-0917
Fax: 289-217-0920

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G German Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. German (CPSO#: 86760 )
Business Address: 7 Paperbark Avenue
Vaughan Ontario L6A 0Y1
416-799-0861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN GERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN GERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007