THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:48:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Bloor Street East
South Tower
Suite 1200
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-1510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Woganee Filate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Filate (CPSO#: 86768 )
Business Address: Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 792-9436
Business Address: 175 Bloor Street East
South Tower
Suite 1200
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
416-646-1510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Bloor Street East
South Tower
Suite 1200
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-1510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9436

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Woganee Filate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Filate (CPSO#: 86768 )
Business Address: Sleep Care Solutions Davisville
Suite 303
1835 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
(416) 792-9436
Business Address: 175 Bloor Street East
South Tower
Suite 1200
Toronto Ontario M4W 3R8
416-646-1510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOGANEE A FILATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILATE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WOGANEE A FILATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILATE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007