THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:26:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenwald (CPSO#: 86773 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench Street
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Aug 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenwald (CPSO#: 86773 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ARYEH GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ARYEH GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007