THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:35:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-0555
Fax: 416-223-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Hershenfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hershenfield (CPSO#: 86779 )
Business Address: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Address: 501 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 223-0555
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-223-0555
Fax: 416-223-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Hershenfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hershenfield (CPSO#: 86779 )
Business Address: 401-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Address: 501 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 223-0555
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN REBECCA HERSHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHENFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN REBECCA HERSHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007