THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 04:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Radiology Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2845
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael P. Loreto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loreto (CPSO#: 86800 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Radiology Department
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 2845
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael P. Loreto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loreto (CPSO#: 86800 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PETER LORETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PETER LORETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007