THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ancaster Medical Centre
103-1144 Wilson St. West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 304-8017
Fax: 905-304-8004
Address: 9-1300 Garth St
Hamilton ON L9C 4L7
Phone: 289-236-1257
Fax: 519-512-0051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Amer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Amer (CPSO#: 86839 )
Business Address: Brantford General
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 103 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
(905) 304-8001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ancaster Medical Centre
103-1144 Wilson St. West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 304-8017
Fax: 905-304-8004
Address: 9-1300 Garth St
Hamilton ON L9C 4L7
Phone: 289-236-1257
Fax: 519-512-0051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Amer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Amer (CPSO#: 86839 )
Business Address: Brantford General
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 103 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
(905) 304-8001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEHMINA AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEHMINA AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007