THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Hill Medical Centre
Unit 3
4637 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 283 4111
Fax: (416) 283 4114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivashankary Prabhakaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prabhakaran (CPSO#: 86866 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Hill Medical Centre
Unit 3
4637 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 283 4111
Fax: (416) 283 4114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivashankary Prabhakaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prabhakaran (CPSO#: 86866 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVASHANKARY YUWARAJ PRABHAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHAKARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVASHANKARY YUWARAJ PRABHAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007