THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:03:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CEBUANO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-0077
Fax: (705) 435-1177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: France Palao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Palao (CPSO#: 86885 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
(705) 435-0077

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CEBUANO, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-0077
Fax: (705) 435-1177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: France Palao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Palao (CPSO#: 86885 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria Street West
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
(705) 435-0077

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCE ANTONIETTE PALAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCE ANTONIETTE PALAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The Visayas, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007