THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 1
Fax: (519) 915-5225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jacobs (CPSO#: 86892 )
Business Address: 202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-9861 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 252-9861
Extension: 1
Fax: (519) 915-5225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jacobs (CPSO#: 86892 )
Business Address: 202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-9861 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE JR JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE JR JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007