THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:58:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Second Military Medical University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hong Ge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ge (CPSO#: 86899 )
Business Address: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
(905) 604-7889

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Second Military Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hong Ge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ge (CPSO#: 86899 )
Business Address: Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham Ontario L3R 0Y5
(905) 604-7889

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HONG GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HONG GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Second Military Medical University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007