THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:48:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200B-745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Phone: 613-741-6767
Fax: 613-741-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier (CPSO#: 86920 )
Business Address: suite 200b-745 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
6137416767

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200B-745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Phone: 613-741-6767
Fax: 613-741-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gauthier (CPSO#: 86920 )
Business Address: suite 200b-745 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
6137416767

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE LOUISE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007