THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:47:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkdale Medical
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mascan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mascan (CPSO#: 86931 )
Business Address: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
(905) 770-9057

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkdale Medical
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mascan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mascan (CPSO#: 86931 )
Business Address: Yorkdale Medical Clinic
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0K7
(905) 770-9057

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAVINIA MARIA MASCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAVINIA MARIA MASCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007