THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 279-0855
Extension: 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Y. T. Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tsui (CPSO#: 86934 )
Business Address: 10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
(416) 479-0855
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W2
(416) 495-2465
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10-78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 279-0855
Extension: 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Y. T. Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tsui (CPSO#: 86934 )
Business Address: 10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
(416) 479-0855
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W2
(416) 495-2465
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 431-8101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON YEE TUEN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON YEE TUEN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007