THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:24:42 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 494-6620
Address: 2250 Bovaird Drive East Suite 401
Brampton Ontario L6R 2T3
Phone: (289) 201-3344
Fax: (289) 201-3355
Address: 412-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J5
Phone: 289 201 3344
Fax: 289 201 3355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. T. Belay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Belay (CPSO#: 86941 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 6595
Fax: (905) 494-6620
Address: 2250 Bovaird Drive East Suite 401
Brampton Ontario L6R 2T3
Phone: (289) 201-3344
Fax: (289) 201-3355
Address: 412-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J5
Phone: 289 201 3344
Fax: 289 201 3355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. T. Belay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Belay (CPSO#: 86941 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALKIDAN TADDES BELAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALKIDAN TADDES BELAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007