THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Charles St East
Arthur Ontario N0G 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 8483798
Fax: 5198486373
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Government Rd
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lin Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lin (CPSO#: 86947 ) Dr. N. Dzaja (CPSO#: 86963 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Charles St East
Arthur Ontario N0G 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 8483798
Fax: 5198486373
Address: 131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Government Rd
Wawa ON P0S 1K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lin Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lin (CPSO#: 86947 ) Dr. N. Dzaja (CPSO#: 86963 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAREN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAREN LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007