THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:33:14 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44761
Fax: 905-522-9826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Brennon Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsang (CPSO#: 86949 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44761
Fax: 905-522-9826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Brennon Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsang (CPSO#: 86949 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRENNON TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRENNON TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007